EP0379720 - Method for increasing the brake power of a four-stroke alternating piston-type internal-combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/31] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neitz, Alfred Sperberstrasse 1b D-8508 Wendelstein / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Joachim, Dipl.-Ing. Schreiberhauserstrasse 8a D-8507 Oberasbach / DE | [1990/31] | Application number, filing date | 89123776.0 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/31] | Priority number, date | DE19893900739 | 12.01.1989 Original published format: DE 3900739 | [1990/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0379720 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0379720 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02D13/04, F02D9/06 | [1990/31] | CPC: |
F02D13/04 (EP,US);
F02M26/01 (EP,US);
F02B2075/027 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1990/31] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Steigerung der Motorbremsleistung bei Viertakt-Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschinen | [1990/31] | English: | Method for increasing the brake power of a four-stroke alternating piston-type internal-combustion engine | [1990/31] | French: | Méthode pour augmenter la puissance de freinage pour moteurs à combustion interne à pistons alternatifs | [1990/31] | Examination procedure | 30.08.1990 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 26.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4664070 (MEISTRICK ZDENEK S [US], et al); | [A]EP0167267 (JACOBS MFG CO [US]); | [A]EP0294682 (JACOBS MFG CO [US]) |