EP0376199 - Nitrogen compounds that delay the metathesis polymerization of cycloolefins [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 19.07.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states HERCULES INCORPORATED Hercules Plaza Wilmington Delaware 19894 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matlack, Albert Shelton 3751 Mill Creek Road Hockessin Delaware 19707 / US | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/35] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/27] | Lederer, Franz, Dr. Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123796.8 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | US19880291940 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: US 291940 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376199 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376199 | Date: | 05.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/08, C08K5/16 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
C08G61/08 (EP,US);
C08F4/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Stickstoffverbindungen zur Verzögerung der Methathesepolymerisation von Cycloolefinen | [1990/27] | English: | Nitrogen compounds that delay the metathesis polymerization of cycloolefins | [1990/27] | French: | Compositions d'azote retardant la polymérisation de méthathèse d'oléfines cycliques | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 17.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/29] | 29.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 14.04.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/36] | 24.04.1994 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2502748 (NIPPON OIL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE2540553 (SHOWA DENKO KK); | [AD]EP0266587 (HERCULES INC [US]) |