EP0376202 - Electrostatographic toners and method of making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.05.1995 [1995/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Amering, Allan Roy c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 02 /
Smith, Dennis Edward c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | 03 /
Spence, John Michael c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department 343 State Street Rochester New York 14650 / US | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr.rer.nat., et al Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123803.2 | 22.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | US19880292470 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: US 292470 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376202 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376202 | Date: | 20.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376202 | Date: | 01.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/08, G03G9/087, G03G9/097 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G03G9/0806 (EP,US);
G03G9/081 (EP,US);
G03G9/08728 (EP,US);
G03G9/08755 (EP,US);
G03G9/08793 (EP,US);
G03G9/09716 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/27] | Title | German: | Elektrostatographische Toner sowie Verfahren zur Herstellung | [1990/27] | English: | Electrostatographic toners and method of making | [1990/27] | French: | Toneurs électrostatographiques et procédé de préparation | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/23] | 17.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0230041 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]GB2197656 (MITA INDUSTRIAL CO LTD); | [A]EP0278523 (CANON KK [JP]) |