EP0376250 - Self-adaptive equalization device for a differentially coherent demodulation arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1996 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 24.01.1996 [1996/04] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL TELSPACE 5, rue Noel Pons 92734 Nanterre Cédex / FR | For:BE
CH
LI
Alcatel N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/02] | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL TELSPACE 5, rue Noel Pons F-92734 Nanterre Cédex / FR | ||
For:BE
CH
LI
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [1990/27] | For:DE
ES
FR
GB
IT
NL
SE
ALCATEL TRANSMISSION PAR FAISCEAUX HERTZIENS A.T.F.H. 55, rue Greffulhe F-92301 Levallois-Perret Cédex / FR | ||
For:BE
CH
LI
ALCATEL N.V. Strawinskylaan 341, (World Trade Center) NL-1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sehier, Philippe 148, rue du Président Wilson F-92300 Levallois Perret / FR | 02 /
Kawas Kaleh, Ghassan Alcatel Transmission Par Faisceaux Hertziens A.T.F.H. 55, rue Greffulhe F-92301 Levallois Perret Cedex / FR | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | Application number, filing date | 89123959.2 | 27.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | FR19880017507 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8817507 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376250 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376250 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
H04L25/03038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Selbst-adaptive Entzerrungseinrichtung für eine differentielle kohärente Demodulationsanordnung | [1990/27] | English: | Self-adaptive equalization device for a differentially coherent demodulation arrangement | [1990/27] | French: | Dispositif d'égalisation auto-adaptative pour installation de démodulation différentiellement cohérente | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 27.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.12.1994 | [1996/04] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4097807 (FUJIMURA NORIAKI); | [A]US4140974 (LINDNER ROBERT) | [A] - 1987 IEEE INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, Philadelphia, PA, 4-7 mai 1987, vol. 2, pages 422-425, IEEE, New York, US; J.B. EVANS et al.: "Variable step size methods for the LMS adaptive algorithm" | [A] - IEEE 1974 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, Minneapolis, Minnesota, 17-19 juillet 1974, pages 25D-1 - 25D-5, IEEE, New York, US; W.J. BARKSDALE et al.: "A linear digital equalizer for fast initialization" |