Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] |
30.12.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 16.02.1994 [1994/07] |
12.03.1992 | First examination report | |
10.07.1990 | Publication of search report | published on 29.08.1990 [1990/35] |
09.06.1990 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |
09.06.1990 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.07.1990 [1990/30] |