Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5194497 | 16.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US45998590 | 02.01.1990 | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 | US67004591 | 15.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0378863 | Global Dossier | 16.02.1994 | B1 | EP0378863 | 29.08.1990 | A3 | EP0378863 | 25.07.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3901030 | 19.07.1990 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE58906999D1 | 24.03.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2061926T | 16.12.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH02228307 | 11.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3901030 | 14.01.1989 |