EP0325334 - Assembly of a cabinet and cash-drawers, as in use with cash-registers and the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bal, Albert Irenelaan 21 NL-3781 VH Voorthuizen / NL | [1989/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir., et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200103.3 | 18.01.1989 | [1989/30] | Priority number, date | NL19880000117 | 19.01.1988 Original published format: NL 8800117 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0325334 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0325334 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G07G1/00, A47B88/22 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
G07G1/0027 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | Montage eines Schranks und Registrierkassenschubladen, wie in Gebrauch bei Kassenregistern und ähnlichen | [1989/30] | English: | Assembly of a cabinet and cash-drawers, as in use with cash-registers and the like | [1989/30] | French: | Assemblage de meuble et tiroirs de caisse, tel qu'en usage dans les caisses enregistreuses et analogues | [1989/30] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1989 | Examination requested [1989/39] | 13.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   05.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.08.1992 | BE | 12.08.1992 | CH | 12.08.1992 | DE | 12.08.1992 | ES | 12.08.1992 | FR | 12.08.1992 | GR | 12.08.1992 | IT | 12.08.1992 | LI | 12.08.1992 | SE | 12.08.1992 | LU | 31.01.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
ES | 12.08.1992 | ||
GR | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
SE | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
GR | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
SE | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
GR | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
LU | 31.01.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
IT | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
FR | 31.12.1992 | ||
Former [1993/19] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
BE | 12.08.1992 | ||
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/15] | AT | 12.08.1992 | |
CH | 12.08.1992 | ||
DE | 12.08.1992 | ||
LI | 12.08.1992 | ||
Former [1993/10] | CH | 12.08.1992 | |
LI | 12.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB493792 (SVENSKA KASSAREGISTERAKTIEBOLA); | [A]US2883104 (KINTNER DONALD J); | [A]FR2535573 (RITZENTHALER SA ETS PHILIPPE [FR]); | [A]EP0234596 (CONTROL COMMERCE AG [CH]) |