EP0326213 - A fabric treatment composition and the preparation thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.1995 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1989/31] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Neillie, William Frederick Soutar 2 Beatty Close Caldy Wirral Merseyside L48 2JT / GB | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London ECV 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/47] | Ford, Michael Frederick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Stancliffe, Terence Christopher UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/31] | Tan, Bian An, Ir. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200113.2 | 19.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | GB19880001861 | 28.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8801861 | GB19880001905 | 28.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8801905 | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326213 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326213 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326213 | Date: | 09.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D06M13/46, D06M23/00, C11D1/94, C11D1/75 | [1994/45] | CPC: |
C11D1/90 (EP,US);
C11D1/94 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
D06M13/388 (EP,US);
D06M23/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/37] | D06M13/46, D06M21/00, C11D1/94, C11D1/75 | ||
Former IPC [1989/31] | D06M13/46, D06M21/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/31] | Title | German: | Textilbehandlungszubereitung und deren Herstellung | [1989/31] | English: | A fabric treatment composition and the preparation thereof | [1989/31] | French: | Composition pour le traitement de matériaux textiles et sa préparation | [1989/31] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3537993 (COWARD TODD L, et al); | [XD]GB1260584 (ARMOUR IND CHEM CO [US]); | [X]GB2075043 (FLANAGAN J J); | [A]FR1568522 |