EP0327155 - Pyrazines, pyrimidines and pyridazines, useful in the treatment of senile dementia [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.10.1997 [1997/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states MERCK SHARP & DOHME LTD. Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9NU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Raymond Bulls Cottage Green Tye Much Hadham Hertfordshire / GB | 02 /
Saunders, John 13 The Ridings Thorley Park Bishops Stortford Hertfordshire / GB | 03 /
Street, Leslie J. 99 Spruce Hill Harlow Essex / GB | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1989/32] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200147.0 | 23.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | GB19880002101 | 30.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8802101 | GB19880015225 | 27.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8815225 | GB19880017812 | 26.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8817812 | GB19880021088 | 08.09.1988 Original published format: GB 8821088 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0327155 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0327155 | Date: | 02.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C07D453/02, C07D453/06, C07D471/08, C07D403/04, A61K31/50, A61K31/505, // C07D207/16, C07D241/18, C07D241/16 ,(C07D471/08, 221:00, 209:00),(C07D471/08, 223:00, 221:00) | [1989/32] | CPC: |
C07D451/02 (EP);
C07D239/28 (KR);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
C07D401/04 (EP);
C07D403/04 (EP);
C07D403/12 (EP);
C07D453/02 (EP);
C07D453/06 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | In der Behandlung von dementia senilis verwendbare Pyrazine, Pyrimidine und Pyridazine | [1989/32] | English: | Pyrazines, pyrimidines and pyridazines, useful in the treatment of senile dementia | [1989/32] | French: | Pyrazines, pyrimidines et pyridazines utiles dans le traitement de dementia senilis | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.09.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/44] | 02.05.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/44] | Request for further processing for: | 16.10.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 16.10.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.11.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP49011710B ; | [X]EP0122580 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]); | [AD]EP0239309 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB]) | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 81, No. 15, 14 October 1974; Columbus, Ohio, US; page 469, right-hand column, abstract no. 91556x & JP-B-49 011 710 (H. MORI) 19 March 1974, & JP49011710B B 19740319 | [ ] - VESTNIK SLOVENSKEGA KEMIJSKEGA DRUSTVA vol. 33, no. 3, July 1986, pages 197 - 215; G. HEINISCH ET AL: "Synthetic investigations directed to aza-nicotines and cogeners" page 199, scheme 1, formulae 4a-c, 5a-c, 6a-c; page 202, scheme 4, formula 14; page 204, scheme 6, formula 18 | [X] - VESTNIK SLOVENSKEGA KEMIJSKEGA DRUSTVA vol. 33, no. 3, July 1986, pages 197 - 215; G. HEINISCH ET AL: "Synthetic investigations directed to aza-nicotines and cogeners" | [X] - BULLETIN DES SOCIETES CHIMIQUES BELGES vol. 75, no. 1-2, 1966, pages 5 - 16; G. ROSSEELS: "Contribution à l'étude d'acides de la série de la pyridazine. IV. Nouvel alcaloïde de synthèse, l'aza-2-nicotine" | [A] - JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY vol. 24, no. 12, 1981, pages 1475 - 1482; U. HACKSELL ET AL: "3-Phenylpiperidines. Central dopamine-autoreceptor stimulating activity" |