EP0334406 - Matrix display devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.08.1994 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | For:GB
PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LIMITED 420-430 London Road Croydon CR9 3QR / GB | ||
For:CH
DE
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Alan George c/o PHILIPS RESEARCH LABORATORIES Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [1989/39] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/39] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al Philips Electronics UK Limited Patents and Trade Marks Department Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200406.0 | 20.02.1989 | [1989/39] | Priority number, date | GB19880004326 | 24.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8804326 | [1989/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0334406 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0334406 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0334406 | Date: | 06.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/133, G09G3/36 | [1989/39] | CPC: |
G02F1/13624 (EP,US);
G09G3/367 (EP,US);
G02F1/1365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/39] | Title | German: | Matrix-Anzeigevorrichtungen | [1989/39] | English: | Matrix display devices | [1989/39] | French: | Dispositifs d'affichage matriciel | [1989/39] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 05.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 06.10.1993 | IT | 06.10.1993 | LI | 06.10.1993 | NL | 06.10.1993 | SE | 06.10.1993 | [1999/42] |
Former [1997/17] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/39] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
NL | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/27] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | ||
SE | 06.10.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | CH | 06.10.1993 | |
LI | 06.10.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2549265 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]); | [A]FR2537316 (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP]) |