EP0331234 - Circuit arrangement for linearly amplifying and demodulating an AM-modulated signal, and integrated semiconductor element for said circuit arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.03.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Garskamp, Arnoldus c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/36] | Representative(s) | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 5 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/35] | Steenbeek, Leonardus Johannes, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | ||
Former [1989/36] | van Gils, Cornelis Johannes Maria INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200428.4 | 22.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | NL19880000510 | 29.02.1988 Original published format: NL 8800510 | [1989/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331234 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331234 | Date: | 19.05.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H03G7/00, H03D1/00, G06G7/24 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
H03G7/001 (EP,US);
H03F3/04 (KR);
G06G7/24 (EP,US);
H03D1/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/36] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zum linearen Verstärken und Demodulieren eines AM-modulierten Signals und dazu geeignetes integriertes Halbleiterelement | [1989/36] | English: | Circuit arrangement for linearly amplifying and demodulating an AM-modulated signal, and integrated semiconductor element for said circuit arrangement | [1989/36] | French: | Circuit d'amplification et de démodulation linéaires d'un signal à modulation AM et élément semi-conducteur intégré conçu à cet effet | [1989/36] | Examination procedure | 02.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/18] | 09.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.06.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 19.05.1993 | [1994/01] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3605027 (NICHOLS DANIEL R, et al); | [A]US3757136 (HUGHES R); | [A]DE2545535 (ROHDE & SCHWARZ); | [AD]GB1600117 (MULLARKEYW J) | [A] - U. TIETZE et al.: "Halbleiter-Schaltungstechnik", 1980, pages 210-211, Springer-Verlag, Berlin, DE | [A] - ELEKTROTECHNIK, vol. 58, no. 6, 25th March 1976, pages 23-24, Würzburg, DE; G. HARMS: "Grundlagen und Praxis der Linear-Verstärker" |