EP0331248 - Antenna system with adjustable beam width and beam orientation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.1995 [1995/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 7554 RR Hengelo / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 NL-7554 RR Hengelo / NL | ||
Former [1989/36] | For all designated states HOLLANDSE SIGNAALAPPARATEN B.V. Zuidelijke Havenweg 40 P.O. Box 42 NL-7550 GD Hengelo / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reits, Bernard Jozef Oelerweg 98A NL-7555 GW Hengelo / NL | [1989/36] | Application number, filing date | 89200449.0 | 23.02.1989 | [1989/36] | Priority number, date | NL19880000538 | 03.03.1988 Original published format: NL 8800538 | [1989/36] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0331248 | Date: | 06.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0331248 | Date: | 28.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/01, H01Q15/14, H01Q15/20 | [1989/36] | CPC: |
H01Q3/01 (EP,US);
H01Q15/147 (EP,US);
H01Q15/167 (EP,US);
H01Q19/065 (EP,US);
H01Q25/002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1994/20] |
Former [1989/36] | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Antennensystem mit verstellbarer Bündelbreite und Bündelrichtung | [1994/39] | English: | Antenna system with adjustable beam width and beam orientation | [1989/36] | French: | Système d'antenne à largeur du faisceau et orientation ajustables | [1989/36] |
Former [1989/36] | Antennensystem mit verstelbarer Bündelbreite und Bündelrichtung | Examination procedure | 03.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/01] | 09.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2408373 (JEN CHU LAN); | [A]US3076964 (REINHOLD RICHARD S); | [A]GB1382094 (HUSBAND H C); | [A]US4090204 (FARHAT NABIL HASSAN); | [A]DE3146894 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]); | [A]EP0091343 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ANTENNAS AND PROPAGATION, vol. AP-14, no. 5, September 1966, pages 559-560, US; A.C. SCHELL: "The multiplate antenna" | Examination | US3978484 |