EP0332270 - Fabric conditioning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [2001/27] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1989/37] | For:CH
DE
ES
FR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, John Robert 16 Prenton Hall Road Prenton Birkenhead Merseyside L43 0RA / GB | 02 /
Neillie, William Frederick Soutar 2 Beatty Close Caldy Wirral Merseyside L48 2JT / GB | 03 /
Turner, Graham Andrew 2 Redbrook Close, Bromborough Wirral, Merseyside L62 6EA / GB | 04 /
Wraige, Douglas 61 St. James Avenue, Upton Chester, Cheshire, CH2 1NN / GB | [1989/37] | Representative(s) | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/22] | Elliott, Peter William, et al Unilever plc Patent Department, Colworth House Sharnbrook Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [2000/34] | Waldren, Robin Michael, et al Lloyd Wise, Treager & Co., Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | ||
Former [1990/10] | Stancliffe, Terence Christopher, et al UNILEVER PLC Patent Division Colworth House Sharnbrook GB-Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/37] | Tan, Bian An, Ir. Unilever N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 89200545.5 | 06.03.1989 | [1989/37] | Priority number, date | GB19880005837 | 11.03.1988 Original published format: GB 8805837 | [1989/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0332270 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0332270 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332270 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0332270 | Date: | 04.07.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/00, C11D3/30, C11D1/88 | [1989/37] | CPC: |
C11D1/75 (EP);
C11D1/94 (EP);
C11D3/0015 (EP);
C11D1/40 (EP);
C11D1/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/37] | Title | German: | Wäscheweichmacherzusammensetzung | [1989/37] | English: | Fabric conditioning composition | [1989/37] | French: | Composition de conditionnement pour le linge | [1989/37] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 02.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.10.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 03.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.1997
13.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE Opponent's representative Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner, et al, et al Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.03.1997
13.03.1997
ADMISSIBLE PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROPEAN TECHNICAL CENTER N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE Opponent's representative TER MEER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, et al, et al Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | 11.04.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.10.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.09.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1998 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 10.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 25.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 16.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 01.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 17.10.2000 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.10.2000 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 01.02.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.04.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 05.06.1996 | LI | 05.06.1996 | NL | 05.06.1996 | SE | 05.09.1996 | [2003/07] |
Former [1997/29] | CH | 05.06.1996 | |
LI | 05.06.1996 | ||
SE | 05.09.1996 | ||
Former [1997/17] | SE | 05.09.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0210704 (PROCTER & GAMBLE EUROP [BE], et al); | [Y]GB2160886 (FIRMENICH & CIE); | [A]EP0026528 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al); | [A]FR2593517 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US]); | [AD]EP0199382 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | Opposition | DD251784 | DE2805767 | EP0125031 | EP0239910 | US4238531 |