EP0388530 - Fibre-optic gyroscopes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/44] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | ||
Former [1990/39] | For all designated states BRITISH AEROSPACE PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY Warwick House, P.O. Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants. GU14 6YU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Varnham, Malcolm P. British Aerospace Public Limited Company (Dynamics) Ltd Six Hills Way Stevenage Herts, SG1 2AS / GB | [1990/39] | Representative(s) | Dowler, Edward Charles, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate Intellectual Property Department ParkEast, PO Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants GU14 6YU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | Dowler, Edward Charles, et al British Aerospace plc Corporate Intellectual Property Department ParkEast, PO Box 87, Farnborough Aerospace Centre Farnborough, Hants GU14 6YU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200685.9 | 20.03.1989 | [1990/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0388530 | Date: | 26.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0388530 | Date: | 28.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72 | [1990/39] | CPC: |
G01C19/726 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1990/39] | Title | German: | Optischer Faserkreisel | [1990/39] | English: | Fibre-optic gyroscopes | [1990/39] | French: | Gyroscope à fibre optique | [1990/39] | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/50] | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/42] | Request for further processing for: | 14.01.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 14.01.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.02.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0153123 ; | [A]GB2134248 ; | [A]GB2178162 ; | [A]GB2108652 |