EP0339709 - Antifungal compositions and method of controlling mycotic infections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck & Co., Inc. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/44] | For all designated states MERCK & CO. INC. 126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onishi, Janet C. 350 Cherry Hill Road Mountainside New Jersey 07092 / US | 02 /
Patchett, Arthur A. 1090 Minisink Way Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | [1989/44] | Representative(s) | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/20] | Cole, William Gwyn European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [1989/44] | Hesketh, Alan, Dr. European Patent Department Merck & Co., Inc. Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow Essex, CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89200933.3 | 13.04.1989 | [1989/44] | Priority number, date | US19880182615 | 18.04.1988 Original published format: US 182615 | [1989/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0339709 | Date: | 02.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0339709 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0339709 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, // (A61K31/575, 31:335) | [1989/44] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61P31/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/575, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/575, A61K31/335 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1989/44] | Title | German: | Schimmelhemmende Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Kontrolle von Schimmelinfektionen | [1989/44] | English: | Antifungal compositions and method of controlling mycotic infections | [1989/44] | French: | Compositions antifongiques et procédé pour contrôler les infections mycosiques | [1989/44] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 06.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/01] | 04.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 17.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 31.03.1993 | FR | 31.03.1993 | IT | 31.03.1993 | NL | 31.03.1993 | CH | 30.04.1993 | LI | 30.04.1993 | GB | 30.06.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
IT | 31.03.1993 | ||
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/41] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
GB | 30.06.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
FR | 20.08.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
CH | 30.04.1993 | ||
LI | 30.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/03] | DE | 31.03.1993 | |
NL | 31.03.1993 | ||
Former [1993/51] | NL | 31.03.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - DIALOG 5686871 Embase (Exerpta Medica) 82-89/15524, Embase no. 84182537; OEHLSCHLAGER et al.: "Azasterol inhibition of Deltasup 2sup 4-sterol methyltransferase of saccharomyces cerevisiae", & BIOCHEMISTRY (USA), 1984, 23/16 (3582-3589) | [A] - DIALOG 6307861 Embase (Exerpta Medica) 82-89/15524 Embase no. 87044510; GEORGOPAPADAPKOU et al.: "Effect of antifungal agents on lipid biosynthesis and membrane integrity in Candida albicans", & ANTIMICROB. AGENTS CHEMOTHER. (USA), 1987, 31/1 (45-51) | [A] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 80, 1985, abstract no. 108104, Biological Abstracts Inc., Philadelphia, PA, US; T.J. BACH: "Selected natural and synthetic enzyme inhibitors of sterol biosynthesis as molecular probes for in vivo studies concerning the regulation of plant growth", & PLANT SCI (SHANNON) 39(3): 183-188. 1985 |