Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0339709
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
30.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
19.08.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.10.1994 [1994/41] |
22.04.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.1994 [1994/24] |
11.03.1994 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.1994 [1994/18] |
03.02.1994 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
30.11.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.01.1994 [1994/03] |
03.11.1993 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.1993 [1993/51] |
30.03.1993 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
12.02.1993 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.03.1993 [1993/13] |
29.08.1991 |
First examination report |
|
13.11.1990 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] |
07.05.1990 |
Publication of search report |
published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] |
16.09.1989 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.11.1989 [1989/44] |