EP0347961 - Plate type heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES, INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states ITT INDUSTRIES INC. 320 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fuerschbach, Raymond F. 132 S. Wrexham Ct. Tonawana New York 14150 / US | 02 /
Creighton, Timothy Peter 41 Weyland St. Buffalo New York 14210 / US | 03 /
Fijas, David Frederick 32 View Ct. Depew New York 14043 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Larsson, Sten Flygt AB Box 1309 171 25 Solna / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Larsson, Sten Flygt AB Box 1309 S-171 25 Solna / SE | Application number, filing date | 89201312.9 | 23.05.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | US19880209228 | 20.06.1988 Original published format: US 209228 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347961 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347961 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F28D9/00 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
F28F9/0246 (EP,US);
F28D9/005 (EP,US);
F28F13/12 (EP,US);
F28F2225/04 (EP,US);
F28F2280/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Plattenwärmeaustauscher | [1989/52] | English: | Plate type heat exchanger | [1989/52] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur du type à plaques | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 09.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR76822E ; | [A]US4592414 (BEASLEY MARVIN D [US]); | [A]US3240268 (ARMES FRED D); | [A]FR2090328 (DEFAWES THOMAS ETS) |