EP0344863 - A method of producing a thin film transistor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/49] | Thin film transistor and method of making same | ||
[1996/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.1997 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 3030 Leuven-Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states INTERUNIVERSITAIR MICROELEKTRONICA CENTRUM VZW Kapeldreef 75 B-3030 Leuven-Heverlee / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kobayashi, Kazuhiro 3-18-5 Minami-tsukaguchi Amagasaki-City Hyogo 661 / JP | 02 /
Baert, Kris August Emilia Ferdinand Platte-Lostraat 17 B-3200 Leuven / BE | 03 /
Nijs, Johan Francis Albert Slotgracht 4 B-3202 Lubbeek / BE | [1989/49] | Representative(s) | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1989/49] | Land, Addick Adrianus Gosling, et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 NL-2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201379.8 | 30.05.1989 | [1989/49] | Priority number, date | NL19880001379 | 30.05.1988 Original published format: NL 8801379 | [1989/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0344863 | Date: | 06.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0344863 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/84, H01L21/86, H01L21/205, H01L29/78 | [1989/49] | CPC: |
H01L29/66757 (EP,US);
H01L29/786 (KR);
H01L21/0242 (EP,US);
H01L21/02532 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
Y10S148/122 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/49] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Dünnfilmtransistors | [1996/34] | English: | A method of producing a thin film transistor | [1996/34] | French: | Procédé pour fabriquer un transistor à film mince | [1996/34] |
Former [1989/49] | Dünnfilmtransistor und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | ||
Former [1989/49] | Thin film transistor and method of making same | ||
Former [1989/49] | Transistor à film mince et procédé pour le fabriquer | Examination procedure | 22.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 12.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.03.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.1995 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.07.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.08.1996 | CH | 21.08.1996 | ES | 21.08.1996 | GR | 21.08.1996 | IT | 21.08.1996 | LI | 21.08.1996 | SE | 21.11.1996 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
ES | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
GR | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
IT | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
CH | 21.08.1996 | ||
LI | 21.08.1996 | ||
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/18] | AT | 21.08.1996 | |
SE | 21.11.1996 | ||
Former [1997/16] | AT | 21.08.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0062079 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN [JP], et al); | [A]US4485121 (MATSUMURA HIDEKI [JP]); | [A]GB2156385 (AGENCY IND SCIENCE TECHN, et al); | [A]EP0161555 (ENERGY CONVERSION DEVICES INC [US]); | [A]US4625224 (NAKAGAWA KATSUMI [JP], et al); | [A]EP0232619 (CANON KK [JP]) | Examination | US4226898 | - Chemical Vapor Deposition for Microelectronics, by A. Sherman, Noyes Publ., N. J. 1987, USA. | - Chemical Vapor Dep. for Microelectronics, by A. Sherman, Noyes Publ., N.J. 1987, USA |