EP0345902 - Support system for the form plates or panels of a concrete flooring which has to be cast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.1992 [1992/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELEGGINGSMAATSCHAPPIJ BOUWMATERIEEL EUROPA B.V. Europaweg 97 NL-5707 CL Helmond / NL | [1989/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Blank, Wilhelm Werner August Otto Hazelaar 4 Helmond / NL | [1989/50] | Representative(s) | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 2596 HG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1989/50] | Lips, Hendrik Jan George, Ir., et al HAAGSCH OCTROOIBUREAU Breitnerlaan 146 NL-2596 HG Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201451.5 | 06.06.1989 | [1989/50] | Priority number, date | NL19880001475 | 08.06.1988 Original published format: NL 8801475 | [1989/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0345902 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0345902 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E04G11/48 | [1989/50] | CPC: |
E04G11/486 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/50] | Title | German: | Tragkonstruktion für die Schalungsplatten oder -wände einer zu giessenden Betondecke | [1989/50] | English: | Support system for the form plates or panels of a concrete flooring which has to be cast | [1989/50] | French: | Structure de support pour plaques ou panneaux de coffrage d'un plancher en béton à couler | [1989/50] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/32] | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/43] | 25.05.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1992 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3147081 ; | [X]EP0227151 ; | [X]DE3004245 ; | [A]EP0022543 |