EP0347989 - Washing machine with improved pump control device for closing a valve, in particular a flap valve, for detergent economy, and control device suited for use in a washing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
FR
GB
NL
SE
WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | For:ES
IT
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1993/06] | For:DE
FR
GB
NL
SE
WHIRLPOOL EUROPE B.V. Luchthavenweg 34 NL-5507 SK Veldhoven / NL | ||
For:ES
IT
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | |||
Former [1989/52] | For:DE
FR
GB
NL
SE
WHIRLPOOL INTERNATIONAL B.V. Tarwelaan 58 NL-5632 KG Eindhoven / NL | ||
For:ES
IT
IRE INDUSTRIE RIUNITE EURODOMESTICI S.R.L. 27, Viale Guido Borghi I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tarrano, Vincenzo c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Guarino, Luciano c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Melio, Jan Dirk, et al Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Melio, Jan Dirk, et al Whirlpool Italia S.r.l., Viale Guido Borghi 27 I-21025 Comerio (Varese) / IT | ||
Former [1989/52] | Zwaan, Andries Willem INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201578.5 | 16.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | IT19880021069 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: IT 2106988 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0347989 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0347989 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/08 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
D06F39/085 (EP,US);
D06F39/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Waschmaschine mit Pumpensteuerung zum Schliessen eines Ventils | [1989/52] | English: | Washing machine with improved pump control device for closing a valve, in particular a flap valve, for detergent economy, and control device suited for use in a washing machine | [1989/52] | French: | Machine à laver avec dispositif de commande de pompe pour fermer une valve | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 18.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/33] | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.09.1992 | NL | 30.09.1992 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.09.1992 | |
NL | 30.09.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | NL | 30.09.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2226698 (SIEMENS ELEKTROGERAETE GMBH); | [A]DE3540741 (MIELE & CIE [DE]) |