EP0349071 - Coccidiosis vaccine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.01.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.03.1995 [1995/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1994/20] | For all designated states Akzo Nobel N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vermeulen, Arno Korhoenderveld 34 NL-5431 HH Cuyk / NL | 02 /
Dijkema, Rein Pensionarisstraat 6 NL-5345 ML Oss / NL | 03 /
Kok, Jacobus Johannes De Meeuwse Acker 1128 NL-6546 DH Nijmegen / NL | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Hermans, Frans G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 5340 BH Oss / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Hermans, Franciscus G.M., et al Patent Department AKZO NOBEL N.V. Pharma Division P.O. Box 20 NL-5340 BH Oss / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201659.3 | 23.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | NL19880001627 | 27.06.1988 Original published format: NL 8801627 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349071 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349071 | Date: | 23.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/30, A61K39/012, C07K13/00, C12P21/02 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C07K14/455 (EP,US);
C12N15/00 (KR);
A61K39/012 (KR);
A61P33/02 (EP);
C12N15/11 (KR);
A61K39/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/01] | Title | German: | Coccidiosis-Vakzin | [1990/01] | English: | Coccidiosis vaccine | [1990/01] | French: | Vaccin contre coccidiose | [1990/01] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 17.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.09.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0223710 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [Y]EP0231537 (SOLVAY [BE]); | [Y]EP0256536 (CHILWALNER PARTNERSHIP [IL]) |