EP0353797 - A functionalized polyurethane which can be used to prepare aqueous dispersions of polymer hibrids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.1992 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.1992 | Change - withdrawal | published on 26.02.1992 [1992/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Akzo N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states AKZO N.V. Velperweg 76 NL-6824 BM Arnhem / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buter, Roelof Surinkhof 1 NL-6952 HT Dieren / NL | 02 /
Roelofs, Andreas Henricus Johannes Cadier en Keerpad 16 NL-6845 HV Arnhem / NL | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 6800 SB Arnhem / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Sieders, René, et al AKZO NOBEL N.V. Patent Department (Dept. CO) P.O. Box 9300 NL-6800 SB Arnhem / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201689.0 | 27.06.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | NL19880001655 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: NL 8801655 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353797 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/08, C08G18/67, C08F299/06 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
C08F299/06 (EP);
C08G18/00 (KR);
C08G18/0823 (EP);
C08G18/10 (EP);
C08G18/672 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08G18/10, C08G18/42 (EP);
C08G18/10, C08G18/706 (EP);
C08G18/672, C08G18/0823 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/06] | Title | German: | Funktionalisiertes Polyurethan, verwendbar zur Herstellung von wässrigen Polymerhybriddispersionen | [1990/06] | English: | A functionalized polyurethane which can be used to prepare aqueous dispersions of polymer hibrids | [1990/06] | French: | Polyuréthane fonctionnalisé utilisable pour la préparation de dispersions aqueuses de polymères hybrides | [1990/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 16.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/28] | 06.12.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0167188 (POLYVINYL CHEMIE HOLLAND [NL]); | [X]EP0098752 (RESEM SPA [IT]); | [XD]EP0189945 (WITCO CHEMICAL CORP [US]); | [A]FR2402672 (BAYER AG [DE]) |