EP0349087 - Process for the reduction of carbonyl compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.1993 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.09.1993 [1993/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 NL-2596 HR Den Haag / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van Leeuwen, Petrus Wilhelmus Nicolaas Maria Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Roobeek, Cornelis Franciscus Badhuisweg 3 NL-1031 CM Amsterdam / NL | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1992/37] |
Former [1991/34] | Tuijn, Jan Warnaar, et al Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Intellectual Property Division P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [1990/01] | Aalbers, Onno P.O. Box 162 NL-2501 AN The Hague / NL | Application number, filing date | 89201714.6 | 27.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | GB19880015328 | 28.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8815328 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0349087 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0349087 | Date: | 09.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/136, C07C29/14 | [1990/01] | CPC: |
C07C29/145 (EP,US);
C07C29/141 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/16 (EP,US);
C07C2602/42 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/141, C07C31/10 (EP,US);
C07C29/141, C07C31/12 (EP,US);
C07C29/141, C07C31/125 (US,EP);
C07C29/141, C07C33/14 (EP,US);
C07C29/141, C07C35/08 (EP,US);
C07C29/141, C07C35/29 (EP,US);
C07C29/145, C07C31/10 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C31/12 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/025 (US,EP);
C07C29/145, C07C33/14 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Reduktion von Carbonylverbindungen | [1990/01] | English: | Process for the reduction of carbonyl compounds | [1990/01] | French: | Procédé de réduction de composés carbonylés | [1990/01] | Examination procedure | 23.05.1990 | Examination requested [1990/29] | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4418227 (PEZ GUIDO P [US], et al); | [A]US4072720 (HAAG WERNER O, et al); | [A]GB1529619 (RHONE POULENC IND) | [AD] - JOURNAL OF THE CHEMICAL SOCIETY, CHEMICAL COMMUNICA- TIONS, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, London, Index 1986 PIET W.N.M. VAN LEEUWEN et al. "Platinom Hydroformyla- tion Catalysts containing Diphenylphosphine Oxide Ligands" pages 31-33 |