EP0351017 - Pharmaceutical composition useful for the treatment of cardiovascular diseases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.01.1995 [1995/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 36100 Vicenza / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states ZAMBON GROUP S.p.A. Via della Chimica, 9 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | ||
Former [1990/03] | For all designated states SIMES, SOCIETA ITALIANA MEDICINALI E SINTETICI, S.P.A. Via della Chimica 9 I-36100 Vicenza / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Casagrande, Cesare Via Campogallo, 21/67 I-20020 Arese (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Licciardello, Luciano Via Borgazzi, 38 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | [1990/03] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/03] | Marchi, Massimo, et al c/o Marchi & Mittler s.r.l. Viale Lombardia 20 I-20131 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89201830.0 | 11.07.1989 | [1990/03] | Priority number, date | IT19880021369 | 15.07.1988 Original published format: IT 2136988 | [1990/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0351017 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0351017 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0351017 | Date: | 19.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61K45/06, A61K31/22, A61K31/40, A61K31/55, A61K31/675, A61K31/495, A61K31/535, A61K31/395, A61K37/02, // (A61K31/40, 31:22),(A61K31/55, 31:22),(A61K31/675, 31:22),(A61K31/495, 31:22),(A61K31/535, 31:22),(A61K31/395, 31:22),(A61K37/02, 31:22),(A61K45/06, 31:22), A61K31:22, A61K31:195 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/395 (EP,US);
A61K38/556 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/22, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/22, A61K31/195 (US,EP);
A61K31/395, A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/40, A61K31/22 (US,EP);
A61K31/495, A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/535, A61K31/22 (EP,US);
A61K31/55, A61K31/22 (US,EP);
A61K31/675, A61K31/22 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/03] | Title | German: | Pharmazeutische Zusammensetzung, verwendbar bei der Behandlung von Herzgefässerkrankungen | [1990/03] | English: | Pharmaceutical composition useful for the treatment of cardiovascular diseases | [1990/03] | French: | Composition pharmaceutique utile dans le traitement des maladies cardiovasculaires | [1990/03] | Examination procedure | 17.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 05.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CARDIOVASCULAR DRUGS AND THERAPY, vol. 2, 1988, pages 83-91, Kluwer, US; I. CANTELLI, D. BRACCHETTI: "Combinaton of positive inotropic and vasodilating substances in congestive heart failure" |