EP0343757 - Method of joining substrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/48] | Heat recoverable artiles comprising conductive polymer compositions | ||
[1992/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.09.1993 [1993/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RAYCHEM CORPORATION (a Delaware corporation) 300 Constitution Drive Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [1989/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rosenzweig, Nachum 3440 Bryant Street Palo Alto California 94306 / US | 02 /
Soni, Pravin 4811 Kenwood Street Union City California 94587 / US | [1989/48] | Representative(s) | Auckland Cooke, Jacqueline, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/48] | Auckland, Jacqueline, et al Raychem Limited Intellectual Property Law Department Faraday Road Dorcan Swindon, Wiltshire SN3 5HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 89201881.3 | 02.04.1985 | [1989/48] | Priority number, date | US19840596761 | 04.04.1984 Original published format: US 596761 | [1989/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0343757 | Date: | 29.11.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0343757 | Date: | 13.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0343757 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L47/00 | [1989/48] | CPC: |
B29C66/5221 (EP,US);
B29C61/003 (EP,US);
B29C61/0625 (EP,US);
B29C65/68 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/114 (EP,US);
B29C66/1222 (EP,US);
B29C66/1224 (EP,US);
B29C66/12441 (EP,US);
B29C66/52241 (EP,US);
B29C66/5229 (EP,US);
B29C66/52291 (EP,US);
B29C66/52293 (EP,US);
B29C66/636 (EP,US);
F16L47/22 (EP,US);
F16L55/17 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29C66/73756 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/73941 (EP,US);
B29C66/91411 (EP,US);
B29C66/91445 (EP,US);
B29C66/91653 (EP,US);
B29C66/91655 (EP,US);
B29C66/919 (EP,US);
B29C66/949 (EP,US);
B29K2023/06 (EP,US);
B29K2023/0675 (EP,US);
B29K2023/0683 (EP,US);
B29K2707/04 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0005 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0088 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/04 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/06 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/0683 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/10 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/06 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2027/16 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2071/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Verbinden von Substraten | [1992/40] | English: | Method of joining substrates | [1992/40] | French: | Méthode pour joindre des substrats | [1992/40] |
Former [1989/48] | Wärmerückstellfähiger Artikel aus elektrisch leitenden Polymeren | ||
Former [1989/48] | Heat recoverable artiles comprising conductive polymer compositions | ||
Former [1989/48] | Article à reprise thermique en polymères conductrices | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/48] | 24.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 26.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 02.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85302326.5 / EP0157640 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Request for further processing for: | 08.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.07.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 17.07.1989 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.12.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1116878 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [AD]GB1265194 ; | [XD]US4085286 (HORSMA DAVID AUGUST, et al); | [A]DE2832119 (RAYCHEM CORP); | [AD]US4177446 (DIAZ STEPHEN H [US]); | [A]US4252849 (NISHIMURA HIROSHI, et al); | [X]EP0036963 (FISCHER AG GEORG [CH]); | [A]GB2076489 (SECR DEFENCE); | [A]EP0042262 (RAYCHEM SA NV [BE]); | [A]BE894109 (DANHEUX ET MAROYE SA); | [AD]US4421582 (HORSMA DAVID A [US], et al) |