EP0352846 - Process for the preparation of biocatalysts with previously absent stereoselective enzyme activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.1995 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [1990/05] | For all designated states STAMICARBON B.V. Mijnweg 1 NL-6167 AC Geleen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hermes, Hubertus Franciscus Maria Overstraat 59 NL-6151 CM Sittard / NL | 02 /
Peters, Peter Josephus Hubertus Kochstraat 6 NL-6164 HB Geleen / NL | 03 /
Schmitz, Godefridus Johannes Elisabeth Heidepark 7 NL-6051 GN Maasbracht / NL | [1990/05] | Application number, filing date | 89201888.8 | 18.07.1989 | [1990/05] | Priority number, date | NL19880001864 | 23.07.1988 Original published format: NL 8801864 | [1990/05] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352846 | Date: | 31.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352846 | Date: | 12.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/36, C12P41/00, C12N9/52 | [1990/05] | CPC: |
C12N9/48 (EP);
C12N1/36 (EP);
C12P41/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/05] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Biokatalysatoren mit vorher fehlender stereoselektiver Enzymaktivität | [1990/05] | English: | Process for the preparation of biocatalysts with previously absent stereoselective enzyme activity | [1990/05] | French: | Procédé de préparation de biocatalyseurs auparavant dépourvus d'activité enzymatique stéréoselective | [1990/05] | Examination procedure | 24.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/38] | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.10.1994 | BE | 12.10.1994 | ES | 12.10.1994 | FR | 12.10.1994 | IT | 12.10.1994 | NL | 12.10.1994 | SE | 12.01.1995 | DE | 13.01.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
BE | 12.10.1994 | ||
ES | 12.10.1994 | ||
IT | 12.10.1994 | ||
NL | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
BE | 12.10.1994 | ||
IT | 12.10.1994 | ||
NL | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
BE | 12.10.1994 | ||
NL | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
FR | 10.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
BE | 12.10.1994 | ||
NL | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
BE | 12.10.1994 | ||
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
SE | 12.01.1995 | ||
DE | 13.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 12.10.1994 | |
SE | 12.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0179603 (ICI PLC [GB]) | [A] - BIOTECHNOLOGY AND BIOENGINEERING, vol. 14, no. 6, June 1982, pages 1419-1425, John Wiley & Sons, New York, US; H.L.M. LELIEVELD: "The use of continuous cultures for selection and isolation of microorganisms producing extracellular enzymes adapted to extreme environments" |