EP0354624 - A method for identifying and using biosynthetic or regulatory genes for enhanced production of secondary metabolites [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1999/14] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [1990/07] | For all designated states GIST-BROCADES N.V. Wateringseweg 1 NL-2611 XT Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Groenen, Martien A. M. Marshallstraat 60 NL-6671 BK Zetten / NL | 02 /
Veenstra, Annemarie E. Nierop 27 NL-2151 XH Nieuw Vennep / NL | 03 /
Van Solingen, Pieter Rossini 16 NL-2671 VZ Naaldwijk / NL | 04 /
Koekman, Bertus Pieter Prunusstraat 8 NL-2636 BG Schipluiden / NL | [1990/07] | Representative(s) | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, et al DSM Intellectual Property P.O. Box 4 6100 AA Echt / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/07] | Matulewicz, Emil Rudolf Antonius, Dr., et al Gist-Brocades NV Patents and Trademarks Department Wateringseweg 1 P.O. Box 1 NL-2600 MA Delft / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202063.7 | 09.08.1989 | [1990/07] | Priority number, date | EP19880201714 | 11.08.1988 Original published format: EP 88201714 | EP19880202118 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: EP 88202118 | EP19890200522 | 03.03.1989 Original published format: EP 89200522 | [1990/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0354624 | Date: | 14.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0354624 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12N1/20 | [1990/07] | CPC: |
C12N15/1072 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C07K14/375 (EP);
C12N15/52 (EP);
C12N15/80 (EP);
C12N9/1029 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifizierung und Verwendung von biosyntetischen oder regulatorischen Genen zur gesteigerten Produktion von Sekundär-Metaboliten | [1990/07] | English: | A method for identifying and using biosynthetic or regulatory genes for enhanced production of secondary metabolites | [1990/07] | French: | Méthode d'identification et d'utilisation de gènes de biosynthèse ou de régulation pour augmenter la production de métabolites secondaires | [1990/07] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 12.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 26.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/49] | 29.06.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2001/49] | Request for further processing for: | 07.12.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.12.1999 | Decision despatched | 23.05.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 24.05.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 08.06.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.06.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 21.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0233715 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) | [X] - Molecular Cloning, a Laboratory Manual, 1982, pages 224-228, Cold Spring Harbor Laboratory | [X] - Science, Vol. 222, No. 4619, October 7, 1983, pages 135-139; T.D. SARGENT et al.: "Differential gene expression in the gastrula of Xenopus Laevis" | [X] - Nature, Vol. 308, March 8, 1984, pages 149-153; S.M. HEDRICK et al.: "Isolation of cDNA clones encoding T cell-specific membrane-associated proteins" | [AD] - Gene, Vol. 48, 1986, pages 257-266, Elsevier Science Publishers B.V.; G. CARR et al.: "Cloning and expression of the isopenicillin N synthetase gene from Penicillium chrysogenum" | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 105, 1986, page 421, Abstract No. 222438z, Columbus, Ohio, US; G. REVILLA et al.: "Glucose represses formation of delta-(L-alpha-aminoadipyl)-L-cysteinyl-D-valine and isopenicillin N synthase but not penicillin acyltransferase in Penicillium chrysogenum", J. Bacteriol., 1986, 168(2), 947-52. | [AD] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Vol. 108, 1988, page 324, Abstract No. 51779s, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. ALVAREZ et al.: "Purification to homogeneity and characterization of acyl coenzyme A:6-aminopenicillanic acid acyltransferase of Penicillium chrysogenum", & Antimicrob. Agents. Chemother., 1987, 31(11), 1675-82. | [XP] - Mol. Gen. Genet., Vol. 218, 1989, pages 572-576, Springer-Verlag; B. DIEZ et al.: "Two genes in volved in penicillin biosynthesis are linked in a 5.1 kb SAL I fragment in the genome of Penicillium chrysogenum" |