EP0360316 - Alkali metal vapour dispenser [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For all designated states Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 NL-5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van der Marel, Cornelis c/o INT. OCTROOIBUREAU B.V. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220 5600 AE Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Raap, Adriaan Yde, et al INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | Application number, filing date | 89202190.8 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | NL19880002172 | 02.09.1988 Original published format: NL 8802172 | [1990/13] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0360316 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360316 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01J9/395, H01J9/12 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
H01J9/395 (EP,KR,US);
H01J9/12 (EP,US);
H01J2201/3426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/13] | Title | German: | Alkalimetalldampfspender | [1990/13] | English: | Alkali metal vapour dispenser | [1990/13] | French: | Dispensateur de vapeur de métal alcalin | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/47] | 02.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 30.11.1994 | NL | 30.11.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 30.11.1994 | |
NL | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 30.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1194303 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US3945949 (VAN VUCHT JOHANNES HENDRIKUS N, et al); | [A]US4195891 (HELLIER STEPHEN J [IT]) |