EP0368374 - Windmill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states van der Sterren, Martin Leonard Dr. Philipslaan 10 NL-6042 CV Roermond / NL | For all designated states Vandalon, Franciscus Pancratius Maria Hoofdstraat 67 NL-6051 AK Maasbracht / NL | [1990/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/20] | Application number, filing date | 89202546.1 | 10.10.1989 | [1990/20] | Priority number, date | NL19880002485 | 11.10.1988 Original published format: NL 8802485 | [1990/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0368374 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0368374 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F03D7/02 | [1990/20] | CPC: |
F03D1/0658 (EP);
F05B2240/2022 (EP);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1990/20] | Title | German: | Windmotor | [1990/20] | English: | Windmill | [1990/20] | French: | Eolienne | [1990/20] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1990 | Examination requested [1991/09] | 25.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 06.04.1994 | NL | 06.04.1994 | GB | 10.10.1994 | [1995/44] |
Former [1995/12] | DE | 06.04.1994 | |
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | DE | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2516576 (JACOBS CHARLES R); | [A]EP0009052 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM); | [A]US4632637 (TRAUDT RAY F [US]) |