EP0366179 - Process for preparing a precursor of zirconium dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.06.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states ENIRICERCHE S.p.A. Corso Venezia 16 I-20121 Milan / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Castellano, Maurizio Via Timermans 17/15 I-10146 Turin / IT | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | Fusina, Gerolamo, et al Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A, Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1994/11] | De Carli, Erberto ING. BARZANO & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1990/18] | Roggero, Sergio Ing. Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 I-20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 89202590.9 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | IT19880022357 | 19.10.1988 Original published format: IT 2235788 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366179 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366179 | Date: | 18.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01G25/02, C01B13/32 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
C01G25/02 (EP,US);
C01B13/328 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Vorlaüfers für Zirkondioxid | [1990/18] | English: | Process for preparing a precursor of zirconium dioxide | [1990/18] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation d'un précurseur de dioxyde de zirconium | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 01.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/46] | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63185802 ; | [A]JP60251106 ; | [A]JP61204033 ; | [X]FR2621030 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 467 (C-550)[3314], 7th December 1988; & JP-A-63 185 802 (RICOH CO.), & JP63185802 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 123 (C-344)[2180], 8th May 1986; & JP-A-60 251 106 (KOGYO GIJUTSUIN), & JP60251106 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 38 (C-401)[2485], 4th February 1987; & JP-A-61 204 033 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO.), & JP61204033 A 00000000 |