Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE94270T | 15.09.1993 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP89202909 | 17.11.1989 | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0372604 | Global Dossier | 08.09.1993 | B1 | EP0372604 | 13.03.1991 | A3 | EP0372604 | 13.06.1990 | A2 | Priority number | Date | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68909014T | 05.01.1994 | T2 | DE68909014D1 | 14.10.1993 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2044071T | 01.01.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1004011 | 13.11.1998 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT217543Z | 19.12.1991 | Z2 | Priority number | Date | IT2224488 | 02.12.1988 |