EP0378876 - Low - calorie confectionery products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 03.02.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London Greater London EC4P 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1993/09] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | |||
Former [1990/30] | For:AT
BE
CH
DE
ES
FR
GR
IT
LI
NL
SE
UNILEVER N.V. Weena 455 NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / NL | ||
For:GB
UNILEVER PLC Unilever House Blackfriars P.O. Box 68 London EC4P 4BQ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Clarke, Thomas Cyril 9 Bromham Road Biddenham, Bedford MK40 4AF / GB | [1990/30] | Representative(s) | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, et al Unilever Patent Group Olivier van Noortlaan 120 3133 AT Vlaardingen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1990/30] | Mulder, Cornelis Willem Reinier, Dr., et al UNILEVER N.V. Patent Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | Application number, filing date | 89203191.5 | 14.12.1989 | [1990/30] | Priority number, date | GB19880029831 | 21.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8829831 | EP19890200237 | 03.02.1989 Original published format: EP 89200237 | [1990/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0378876 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0378876 | Date: | 08.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0378876 | Date: | 24.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23G3/00, A23G1/00, A23D9/00 | [1993/08] | CPC: |
A23D9/013 (EP);
A23G1/38 (EP);
A23G1/56 (EP);
A23G3/346 (EP);
A23G3/40 (EP);
A23G2200/08 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A23G1/56, A23G2200/08 (EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2200/08 (EP) |
Former IPC [1990/33] | A23G3/00, A23G1/00, A23D5/00 | ||
Former IPC [1990/30] | A23G3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/30] | Title | German: | Kalorienarme Konditorwaren | [1990/30] | English: | Low - calorie confectionery products | [1990/30] | French: | Produit de confiserie à faible teneur en calorie | [1990/30] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.11.1993
30.12.1993
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative De Minvielle-Devaux, Ian Benedict Peter CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1994/03] | 05.01.1994 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 31.10.1994 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 10.11.1994 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 24.02.1993 | IT | 24.02.1993 | ES | 25.05.1993 | GR | 28.05.1993 | CH | 31.12.1993 | LI | 31.12.1993 | [2004/51] |
Former [2004/38] | AT | 24.02.1993 | |
IT | 24.02.1993 | ||
ES | 25.05.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [2002/20] | AT | 24.02.1993 | |
IT | 24.02.1993 | ||
CH | 31.12.1993 | ||
LI | 31.12.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 24.02.1993 | |
CH | 24.02.1993 | ||
IT | 24.02.1993 | ||
LI | 24.02.1993 | ||
Former [1994/25] | AT | 24.02.1993 | |
CH | 24.02.1993 | ||
LI | 24.02.1993 | ||
Former [1993/38] | CH | 24.02.1993 | |
LI | 24.02.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4127679 ; | [YD]US3600186 ; | [XD]US3093481 ; | [A]GB1444820 |