EP0376384 - Information transmission device using statistical coding, transmission and receiving part for such a device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.12.1994 [1994/52] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
GB
IT
TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88 rue Brillat Savarin 75640 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | For:FR
TRT TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES 88 rue Brillat Savarin 75013 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/39] | For:DE
GB
IT
TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88 rue Brillat Savarin F-75640 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | ||
For:FR
TRT TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES 88 rue Brillat Savarin F-75013 Paris / FR | |||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states TELECOMMUNICATIONS RADIOELECTRIQUES ET TELEPHONIQUES T.R.T. 88 rue Brillat Savarin F-75640 Paris Cédex 13 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langlais, Thierry Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 02 /
Bastien, Jean-Paul Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | 03 /
Boisson, Jean-Yves Société Civile S.P.I.D. 209 rue de l'Université F-75007 Paris / FR | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile SPID, 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Chaffraix, Jean, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 89203258.2 | 20.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | FR19880017498 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: FR 8817498 | [1990/27] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376384 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/06, H04L7/04 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G06T9/005 (EP,US);
H04J3/0605 (EP,US);
H04L7/041 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/27] | Title | German: | Informationsübermittlungseinrichtung unter Verwendung von statistischer Kodierung, Sende- und Empfangsteil für eine solche Anordnung | [1990/27] | English: | Information transmission device using statistical coding, transmission and receiving part for such a device | [1990/27] | French: | Dispositif de transmission d'informations utilisant un codage statistique, partie émission et partie réception convenant pour un tel dispositif | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/52] | 03.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2172176 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP0130899 (THOMSON CSF [FR]) | [A] - ELECTRONICS AND COMMUNICATIONS IN JAPAN, vol. 59-A, no. 11, novembre 1976, pages 51-60, Washington, US; Y. SATO et al.: "DPCM coding method using variable-length codes for video telephone signals" | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON INFORMATION THEORY, vol. IT-30, no. 4, juillet 1984, pages 687-693, IEEE, New York, US; T.J. FERGUSON et al.: "Self-synchronizing Huffman codes" |