EP0367364 - Integrated process for the production of aminoacetonitriles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE CHEMICAL CORPORATION 55 Hayden Avenue Lexington Massachusetts 02173 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1993/33] | For all designated states HAMPSHIRE CHEMICAL CORPORATION 55 Hayden Avenue Lexington, Massachusetts 02173 / US | ||
Former [1993/17] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | ||
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. (a Connecticut corp.) Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Su, Jow-Lih 316 Hammonton Place Silver Spring Maryland 20904 / US | 02 /
Sherwin, Martin Barry 11500 Karen Drive Potomac Maryland 20854 / US | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 89250068.7 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | US19880264413 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: US 264413 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367364 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367364 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C07C255/25, C07C253/00 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
C07C255/25 (EP,US);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/19] | Title | German: | Integriertes Verfahren zur Herstellung von Aminoacetonitrilen | [1990/19] | English: | Integrated process for the production of aminoacetonitriles | [1990/19] | French: | Procédé intégré pour la production d'aminoacétonitriles | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 26.06.1990 | Examination requested [1990/34] | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE669808 (BERGWERKSVERBAND GMBH); | [A]EP0102343 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0102935 (MONSANTO CO [US]); | [A]EP0184694 (BASF AG [DE]) |