EP0323896 - Complementary semiconductor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.1997 [1997/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states FUJITSU LIMITED 1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Awano, Yuji Haishiti Omotesando 312-go 14-13, Jingumae 4-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 150 / JP | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300050.5 | 05.01.1989 | [1989/28] | Priority number, date | JP19880000742 | 07.01.1988 Original published format: JP 74288 | JP19880188908 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18890888 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0323896 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0323896 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323896 | Date: | 17.04.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/08, H01L29/161, H01L29/165, H01L21/82 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
H01L29/165 (EP,US);
H01L21/823807 (EP,US);
H01L27/0605 (EP,US);
H01L29/1054 (EP,US);
H01L29/7782 (EP,US);
H01L29/802 (EP,US);
H01L27/092 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/28] | Title | German: | Komplementäre Halbleiteranordnung | [1989/28] | English: | Complementary semiconductor device | [1989/28] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur complémentaire | [1989/28] | Examination procedure | 10.08.1992 | Examination requested [1992/41] | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.08.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61230374 ; | [A]EP0228516 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4556895 (OHATA KEIICHI [JP]) | [A] - PROC. OF THE 2ND INT. SYMPOSIUM ON SILICON MOLECULAR BEAM EPITAXY; ELECTROCHEMICAL SOCIETY 1988 CONF. 20 October 1987, HONOLULU pages 15 - 27; H. DAEMBKES: 'SiGe/Si: High speed devices' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 73 (E-486)(2520) 5 March 1987 & JP-A-61 230 374 ( SEIKO EPSON CORP. ) 14 October 1986, & JP61230374 A 19861014 |