EP0324545 - Plural belt document feeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watson, Peter Roy 267 Vardon Road Stevenage Hertfordshire SG1 5PZ / GB | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | Hill, Cecilia Ann, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300084.4 | 06.01.1989 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | GB19880000720 | 13.01.1988 Original published format: GB 8800720 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324545 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324545 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B65H5/22, B65H5/02, G03G15/00 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
B65H5/026 (EP,US);
B65H5/224 (EP,US);
G03G15/60 (EP,US);
B65H2404/255 (EP,US);
B65H2404/264 (EP,US);
B65H2404/268 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/29] | Title | German: | Mehrfachbandzuführung für Dokumente | [1989/29] | English: | Plural belt document feeder | [1989/29] | French: | Alimentation à courroie multiple pour des documents | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1990 | Examination requested [1990/12] | 05.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | AT317675B [ ] (RANK XEROX LTD); | US4421306 [ ] (MUKA RICHARD S [US]); | EP0220037 [ ] (XEROX CORP [US]) |