EP0324587 - Catalyst composition for the preparation of alpha-olefin polymers with a narrow molecular weight distribution [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.03.1996 [1996/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/29] | For all designated states MOBIL OIL CORPORATION 150 East 42nd Street New York New York 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nowlin, Thomas Edward 139 Hickory Road Somerset New Jersey 08873 / US | 02 /
Schurzky, Kenneth George 707 Meadow Road Bridgewater New Jersey 08807 / US | [1989/29] | Representative(s) | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Colmer, Stephen Gary European Office of Patent Counsel Mobil House 500-600 Witan Gate Central Milton Keynes Buckinghamshire MK9 1ES / GB | ||
Former [1989/29] | Colmer, Stephen Gary Mobil Services Company Limited Patent Department Mobil House 50-60 Victoria Street London SW1E 6QB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300192.5 | 10.01.1989 | [1989/29] | Priority number, date | US19880143989 | 14.01.1988 Original published format: US 143989 | [1989/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0324587 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0324587 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324587 | Date: | 15.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C08F4/62, C08F10/00 | [1989/29] | CPC: |
C08F10/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/6546 (EP,US);
C08F10/00, C08F4/6555 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1989/29] | Title | German: | Katalysatorzusammensetzung zur Herstellung von Alpha-olefin-polymeren mit enger Molekulargewichtsverteilung | [1989/29] | English: | Catalyst composition for the preparation of alpha-olefin polymers with a narrow molecular weight distribution | [1989/29] | French: | Composition de catalyseur pour la préparation de polymères d'alpha-oléfines à distribution de poids moléculaire étroite | [1989/29] | Examination procedure | 29.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 27.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.09.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/44] | deleted | Deletion: Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/46] | 03.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2099438 (ACC CHEM CO, et al); | [YD]EP0231102 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) |