EP0326260 - An imaging sheet roll containing photosensitive microcapsules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yui, Yasuji Patents Division c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Shirakura, Akira Patents Division c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/31] | Representative(s) | Purvis, William Michael Cameron, et al D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1989/31] | Application number, filing date | 89300381.4 | 17.01.1989 | [1989/31] | Priority number, date | JP19880010681U | 29.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1068188 U | [1989/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0326260 | Date: | 02.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0326260 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0326260 | Date: | 17.08.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G03B17/30, G03F7/00 | [1989/31] | CPC: |
G03B17/30 (EP,KR,US);
G03C3/00 (KR);
G03F7/003 (EP,US);
G03B2227/325 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/31] | Title | German: | Filmrolle, versehen mit photoempfindlichen Mikrokapseln | [1989/31] | English: | An imaging sheet roll containing photosensitive microcapsules | [1989/31] | French: | Rouleau de film pourvu de microcapsules photosensibles | [1989/31] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 19.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/51] | 16.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4672014 (JOINER CHARLES W [US], et al); | [A]DE641854 (RAFFLENBEUL GUST FA); | [A]US3894700 (ITO HIROSHI, et al); | [A]FR828325 (KODAK PATHE); | [A]EP0230057 (AGFA GEVAERT NV [BE]) | [Y] - BRITISH JOURNAL OF PHOTOGRAPHY, vol. 126, no. 51, 21st December 1979, pages 1232-1235, London, GB; L.A. MANNHEIM: "Rethinking the 35mm cartridge" | Examination | EP0227041 |