blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0325434

EP0325434 - Track access control system [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.08.1995
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.08.1995No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 04.10.1995 [1995/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi
Kanagawa 211 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]For all designated states
FUJITSU LIMITED
1015, Kamikodanaka, Nakahara-ku
Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanaka, Shigeyoshi
878, Shimonoge Takatsu-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 213 / JP
02 / Yanagi, Shigenori
Hikarihaitsu A-201, 217 Kamikodanaka
Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa 211 / JP
[1989/30]
Representative(s)Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower
20 Primrose Street
London EC2A 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [1989/30]Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date89300458.018.01.1989
[1989/30]
Priority number, dateJP1988000879919.01.1988         Original published format: JP 879988
JP1988001231522.01.1988         Original published format: JP 1231588
[1989/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0325434
Date:26.07.1989
Language:EN
[1989/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0325434
Date:13.06.1990
Language:EN
[1990/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0325434
Date:12.10.1994
Language:EN
[1994/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.04.1990
ClassificationIPC:G11B7/095, G11B21/08
[1994/41]
CPC:
G11B7/08517 (EP,US); G11B25/04 (KR); G11B21/085 (EP,US);
G11B7/0953 (EP,US)
Former IPC [1989/30]G11B7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [1989/30]
TitleGerman:Spurzugangsregelsystem[1989/30]
English:Track access control system[1989/30]
French:Système de contrôle d'accès aux pistes[1989/30]
Examination procedure23.11.1990Examination requested  [1991/03]
02.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.03.1993Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.04.1994Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.07.1994Fee for grant paid
05.07.1994Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.07.1995No opposition filed within time limit [1995/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 03
10.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 04
15.01.1993Renewal fee patent year 05
11.01.1994Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0227044  (TOSHIBA KK [JP])
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN
ExaminationJP62073436
 JP62026644
 JP62110632
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol.11, no.274 (P-612)(2721), 5 September 1987; &JP-A-62 073 436, & JP62073436 A 19870905
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol.11 no.207 (P-592)(2654), 4 July 1987; & JP-A-62 026 644, & JP62026644 A 19870704
    - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol.11, no. 328 (P-629)(2775), 27 October 1987; & JP-A-62 110 632, & JP62110632 A 19871027
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.