Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] |
03.04.1992 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] |
08.11.1990 | First examination report | |
11.10.1989 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.1989 [1989/48] |
08.07.1989 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 23.08.1989 [1989/34] |