Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2590508B | 12.03.1997 | B2 | JPH01188718 | 28.07.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP1248588 | 25.01.1988 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH01206121 | 18.08.1989 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2888088 | 12.02.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0329278 | Global Dossier | 20.05.1992 | B1 | EP0329278 | 23.08.1989 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2888088 | 12.02.1988 | JP1248588 | 25.01.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE68901542D1 | 25.06.1992 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2888088 | 12.02.1988 | JP1248588 | 25.01.1988 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4954120 | 04.09.1990 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2888088 | 12.02.1988 | JP1248588 | 25.01.1988 |