EP0327224 - Fiber-optic reed switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.02.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMO INDUSTRIES INC. Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/12] | For all designated states IMO INDUSTRIES INC. Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states IMO DELAVAL INC. Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rando, Joseph David 68 Flaxfield Drive Dudley Massachusetts 01570 / US | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300527.2 | 19.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | US19880146196 | 20.01.1988 Original published format: US 146196 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327224 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G02B26/02 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
G02B6/3502 (EP,US);
G02B6/3552 (EP,US);
G02B6/3566 (EP,US);
G02B6/3572 (EP,US);
G02B6/3582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Fiberoptischer Reedschalter | [1989/32] | English: | Fiber-optic reed switch | [1989/32] | French: | Commutateur reed fibre-optique | [1989/32] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 22.12.1989 | Examination requested [1990/09] | 05.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/12] | 25.10.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/12] | Request for further processing for: | 08.12.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 08.12.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.01.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1581614 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD); | [X]EP0048867 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4146856 (JAESCHKE JAMES R); | [A]GB1426475 (PLESSEY CO LTD); | [A]DE3338051 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]DE2810858 (FUJITSU LTD) | [X] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED |