EP0327280 - Cyclosporin compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1993 [1993/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sankyo Company Limited 5-1 Nihonbashi Honcho 3-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1989/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurihara, Kozo c/o Sankyo Company Limited 2-58, 1-chome, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | 02 /
Murano, Masaru c/o Sankyo Company Limited 2-58, 1-chome, Hiromachi Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140 / JP | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Gibson, Christian John Robert, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57/60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300856.5 | 27.01.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | JP19880019125 | 29.01.1988 Original published format: JP 1912588 | JP19880111639 | 10.05.1988 Original published format: JP 11163988 | JP19880183127 | 22.07.1988 Original published format: JP 18312788 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327280 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0327280 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/00, A61K37/02, A61K47/14 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
A61K47/14 (EP,US);
A61K38/13 (EP,US);
A61K9/1075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/32] | A61K47/00, A61K37/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Cyclosporin-Zusammensetzungen | [1989/32] | English: | Cyclosporin compositions | [1989/32] | French: | Compositions contenant de la cyclosporine | [1989/32] | Examination procedure | 06.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 15.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 01.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]GB2015339 (SANDOZ LTD); | [Y]EP0143305 (BAYER AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0170623 (SANDOZ AG [CH], et al) |