EP0330318 - Automatic shut-off and self-locking refueling nozzle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1992 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.1992 [1992/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aeroquip AG Hirschgässlein 40 CH-4051 Basel / CH | [1989/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fournier, Paul J. E. 3339 Hendee Road Jackson, MI 49201 / US | 02 /
Kulikowski, Ernest F. 222 S. Kalamazoo Marshal, MI 49068 / US | [1989/35] | Representative(s) | Williams, Trevor John, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | [1989/35] | Application number, filing date | 89300936.5 | 31.01.1989 | [1989/35] | Priority number, date | US19880160270 | 25.02.1988 Original published format: US 160270 | [1989/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0330318 | Date: | 30.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0330318 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B67D5/37, B67D5/377 | [1989/35] | CPC: |
B67D7/46 (EP,US);
B64F1/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1989/35] | Title | German: | Automatisch abschaltender und selbstsperrender Auftankstutzen | [1989/35] | English: | Automatic shut-off and self-locking refueling nozzle | [1989/35] | French: | Pistolet de distribution d'essence à fermeture et blocage automatique | [1989/35] | Examination procedure | 21.07.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 13.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3771575 (MAYER E); | [Y]GB698206 (THOMPSON BROTHERS BILSTON LTD, et al); | [A]US1842462 (SMITH LOUIS R); | [A]US3880214 (SLAVIN JAMES A); | [Y]US1845882 (JOSEPH LITSCHGE); | [A]US2519358 (DAVIES ROBERT H); | [A]GB2177382 (AEROQUIP AG) |