EP0327323 - Ladders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.07.1991 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.09.1991 [1991/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Melland, Tristian Guy 9 Forth Bridge Road Battersea London SW11 / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | For all designated states Melland, Tristian Guy 9 Forth Bridge Road Battersea London SW11 / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/32] | Representative(s) | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/32] | Boyes, Kenneth Aubrey, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89300947.2 | 01.02.1989 | [1989/32] | Priority number, date | GB19880002458 | 04.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8802458 | [1989/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327323 | Date: | 09.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | E06C1/10, E06C7/08 | [1989/32] | CPC: |
E06C7/08 (EP);
E06C1/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/32] | Title | German: | Leiter | [1989/32] | English: | Ladders | [1989/32] | French: | Echelles | [1989/32] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/15] | 02.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/36] | 11.04.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/36] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1053673 ; | [Y]DE2547637 (NAUMANN WOLFGANG); | [Y]DE3442710 (HABER DIETER); | [Y]US2788167 (MORRISON HAROLD E); | [A]GB1508436 (HICKMAN DESIGNS LTD) |