EP0328298 - Manufacture of relief holograms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MARKEM SYSTEMS LIMITED Ladywell Trading Estate Eccles New Road Salford M5 2DA Lancashire / GB | For all designated states ADVANCED HOLOGRAPHICS LIMITED 243-253 Lower Mortlake Road Richmond Surrey; TW9 2LL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states MARKEM SYSTEMS LIMITED Ladywell Trading Estate Eccles New Road Salford M5 2DA Lancashire / GB | ||
For all designated states ADVANCED HOLOGRAPHICS LIMITED 243-253 Lower Mortlake Road Richmond Surrey; TW9 2LL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tomkins, Don William 83 Beacon Road Loughborough Leicester, LE11 2BG / GB | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Massey, Alexander, et al MARKS & CLERK, Sussex House, 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [1989/33] | Application number, filing date | 89300986.0 | 01.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | GB19880003252 | 12.02.1988 Original published format: GB 8803252 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328298 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328298 | Date: | 22.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B29C43/22, B29C35/08, G03H1/02 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
B29C43/222 (EP);
B29C35/10 (EP);
G03H1/0276 (EP);
B29C2035/0827 (EP);
B29K2105/0002 (EP);
B29L2017/003 (EP);
B29L2031/7224 (EP);
G03H1/0244 (EP);
G03H2001/185 (EP);
G03H2227/04 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | Herstellung von Reliefhologrammen | [1989/33] | English: | Manufacture of relief holograms | [1989/33] | French: | Fabrication d'hologrammes en relief | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 12.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 23.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.06.1991 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4420502 ; | [X]EP0079759 ; | [X]US4543225 ; | [X]JPS60254174 ; | [X]JPS58144879 ; | [A]JPS61156273 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 132 (P-456)[2189]16th May 1986; & JP-A-60 254 174 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 14-12-1985 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 262 (P-238)[1407]22nd November 1983; & JP-A-58 144 879 (DAINIPPON INSATSU K.K.) 24-08-1983 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 361 (P-523)[2418], 4th December 1986; & JP-A-61 156 273 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO.LTD) 15-07-1986 |