EP0328333 - Process for producing ceramic superconductors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.1993 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.1993 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.1993 [1993/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building, Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION Westinghouse Building Gateway Center Pittsburgh Pennsylvania 15222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Charles, Robert George 4873 Christopher Drive Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | 02 /
Mazelsky, Robert 140 Burke Drive Monroeville, PA 15146 / US | 03 /
Schmidt, Dennis Norbert 4806 Lima Way Pittsburgh, PA 15224 / US | 04 /
Cifone, William Sam 14541 Watson Drive Irwin, PA 15642 / US | 05 /
Szedon, John Robert 20 Greenwood Road Pittsburgh, PA 15221 / US | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 30 The Green Calne Wiltshire SN11 8DJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | van Berlyn, Ronald Gilbert 23, Centre Heights London NW3 6JG / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301140.3 | 06.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | US19880154393 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: US 154393 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328333 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328333 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L39/24, C04B35/50 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
H10N60/0464 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1989/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von supraleitenden Keramiken | [1989/33] | English: | Process for producing ceramic superconductors | [1989/33] | French: | Procédé pour la fabrication de céramiques supraconductrices | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 27.03.1993 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3594216 (CHARLES ROBERT G, et al); | [A]EP0125638 (KANEGAFUCHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [X]US4485094 (PEBLER ALFRED R [US], et al); | [E]DE3827069 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [DE]) |