EP0328346 - Noise reduction circuits [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.1995 [1995/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumoto, Hiroaki c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
Senda, Tetsuya c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 03 /
Fukuda, Tokuya c/o Patents Division Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1989/33] | Application number, filing date | 89301173.4 | 07.02.1989 | [1989/33] | Priority number, date | JP19880029824 | 10.02.1988 Original published format: JP 2982488 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0328346 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0328346 | Date: | 24.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0328346 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/21, H03G7/00 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
H03G7/002 (EP,US);
H04N5/213 (KR);
H04N5/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/33] | H04N5/21 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/33] | Title | German: | Schaltungen zur Rauschverminderung | [1989/33] | English: | Noise reduction circuits | [1989/33] | French: | Circuits de réduction de bruit | [1989/33] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 06.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP6326168 ; | [A]US3278866 (BOSE AMAR G); | [A]GB2052220 (SONY CORP); | [A]GB2142204 (RCA CORP); | [A]GB2179820 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 234 (E-629)[3081], 5th July 1988; & JP-A-63 26 168 (TOSHIBA) 03-02-1988, & JP6326168 A 00000000 |