EP0336534 - Compositions for foundry molding processes utilizing reclaimed sand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.05.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ACME RESIN CORPORATION 10330 West Roosevelt Road Westchester Illinois 60153 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | For all designated states ACME RESIN CORPORATION 10330 West Roosevelt Road Westchester Illinois 60153 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iyer, S. Raja 1148 Needham Naperville Illinois 60340 / US | 02 /
Johnson, Calvin K. 13725 Pottawatomi Trail Lockport Illinois 60441 / US | 03 /
Cooke, Richard C. 2900 Lincoln Avenue, Apt. 302 North Riverside Illinois 60546 / US | [1989/41] | Representative(s) | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/43] | Wilkinson, Stephen John, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [1989/41] | Wilkinson, Stephen John Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St. Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301202.1 | 08.02.1989 | [1989/41] | Priority number, date | US19880179391 | 08.04.1988 Original published format: US 179391 | [1989/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0336534 | Date: | 11.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0336534 | Date: | 22.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/22 | [1989/41] | CPC: |
B22C1/02 (EP,US);
B22C1/22 (KR);
B22C1/2253 (EP,US);
B22C9/10 (KR);
C08G16/02 (EP,US);
C08G8/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/41] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung von aufbereitetem Sand für Giessformen | [1989/41] | English: | Compositions for foundry molding processes utilizing reclaimed sand | [1989/41] | French: | Composition pour moules de founderie utilisant du sable traité | [1989/41] | Examination procedure | 02.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 12.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE1065605 [ ]; | DE1171606 [ ] (HELMUTH ORTH DR); | GB2059972 [ ] (BORDEN UK LTD); | US4426467 [ ] (QUIST INGMAR P [GB], et al); | US4468359 [ ] (LEMON PETER H R B [GB], et al); | US4474904 [ ] (LEMON PETER H R B [GB], et al); | GB2177408 [ ] (CATALIN LIMITED) |