EP0329400 - Semiconductor thin film and process for fabricating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.07.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.1994 [1994/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | For all designated states Oki Electric Industry Company, Limited 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Horikawa, Hideaki 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minatoku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Akiyama, Masahiro 7-12, Toranomon 1-chome Minatoku Tokyo / JP | [1989/34] | Representative(s) | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins Halton House 20/23 Holborn London EC1N 2JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/34] | Boydell, John Christopher, et al Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 Serjeants' Inn Fleet Street London EC4Y 1LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89301423.3 | 15.02.1989 | [1989/34] | Priority number, date | JP19880031878 | 16.02.1988 Original published format: JP 3187888 | [1989/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0329400 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0329400 | Date: | 16.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0329400 | Date: | 22.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/18, H01L33/00, H01L21/205 | [1989/34] | CPC: |
H01L33/0066 (EP,US);
H01L21/02381 (EP,US);
H01L21/02461 (EP,US);
H01L21/02463 (EP,US);
H01L21/02502 (EP,US);
H01L21/02513 (EP,US);
H01L21/02543 (EP,US);
H01L21/0262 (EP,US);
H01L31/1852 (EP,US);
Y02E10/544 (US);
Y10S148/025 (EP,US);
Y10S148/072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1989/34] | Title | German: | Halbleiter-Dünnschicht und Herstellungsverfahren | [1989/34] | English: | Semiconductor thin film and process for fabricating the same | [1989/34] | French: | Couche mince semi-conductrice et procédé pour sa formation | [1989/34] | Examination procedure | 23.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/12] | 18.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.03.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4561916 (AKIYAMA MASAHIRO [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0291346 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - SOLID STATE TECHNOLOGY. vol. 30, no. 11, November 1987, WASHINGTON US pages 91 - 97; K.KAMINISHI: "GaAs ON Si TECHNOLOGY" | [A] - APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS. vol. 52, no. 3, 18 January 1988, NEW YORK US pages 209 - 211; M.Razeghi et al.: "High-quality GaInAsP/InP heterostructures grown by low-pressure metalorganic chemical vapor deposition on silicon substrates" |